TN SB1344 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-06-09 - Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 12/1/2020
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, allows courts to order a person into a program of assisted outpatient mental health treatment upon finding certain conditions are met; provides a process for certain persons to petition a court on behalf of a proposed patient; establishes criteria for the evaluation of proposed patients and reporting to the court by physicians and certain mental health professionals. - Amends TCA Title 33.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, allows courts to order a person into a program of assisted outpatient mental health treatment upon finding certain conditions are met; provides a process for certain persons to petition a court on behalf of a proposed patient; establishes criteria for the evaluation of proposed patients and reporting to the court by physicians and certain mental health professionals. - Amends TCA Title 33.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-09SenateAction deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 12/1/2020
2020-06-08SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 6/9/2020
2020-06-02SenateAction deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 6/9/2020
2020-06-01SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 6/2/2020
2020-03-10SenateReset on Final calendar of Senate Judiciary Committee
2020-03-04SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/10/2020
2019-02-11SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2019-02-07SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-02-07SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0969 (Crossfiled) 2020-06-11 - Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/15/2020

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback