TN HB0966 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-07 - Failed in s/c Health Subcommittee of Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-07 - Failed in s/c Health Subcommittee of Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, removes the requirement to obtain a certificate of need to establish or relocate certain healthcare facilities or initiate certain healthcare services, except for the initiation of services for a burn unit or organ transplantation. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 33; Title 68 and Title 71.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 33; Title 68 and Title 71, relative to certificates of need.
Sponsors
Rep. Bud Hulsey [R] | Rep. Monty Fritts [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-07 | House | Failed in s/c Health Subcommittee of Health Committee |
2023-03-03 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-03-01 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/7/2023 |
2023-02-28 | House | Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 3/7/2023 |
2023-02-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 2/28/2023 |
2023-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2023-02-02 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee |
2023-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-01-30 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1093 (Crossfiled) 2023-02-06 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee