TN HB0957 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-17 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-17 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the bureau to create a system by which victims of sexual assault offenses can obtain the location and status of the victim's sexual assault evidence collection kit using a tracking number; changes various timelines for collecting, storing, and submitting sexual assault collection kits. - Amends TCA Title 38, Chapter 6, Part 1 and Section 39-13-519.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 38, Chapter 6, Part 1 and Section 39-13-519, relative to sexual offenses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-17 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee |
2021-03-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/17/2021 |
2021-03-10 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/17/2021 |
2021-03-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/10/2021 |
2021-02-25 | House | Sponsor(s) withdrawn. |
2021-02-25 | House | Sponsor change. |
2021-02-22 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2021-02-22 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2021-02-11 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-10 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0567 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-09 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee