TN HB0946 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-06 - Taken off notice for cal. in Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-06 - Taken off notice for cal. in Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, establishes a deadline of January 1 for the submission of the annual plan of expenditures with relation to state grant-in-aid funds submitted by each county to the commissioner of health. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5 and Title 68.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 5 and Title 68, relative to health.
Sponsors
Rep. Bob Ramsey [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-06 | House | Taken off notice for cal. in Health Committee |
2022-03-30 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 4/6/2022 |
2022-03-30 | House | Action def. in Health Committee to 4/6/2022 |
2022-03-23 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/30/2022 |
2022-03-22 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee |
2022-03-16 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/22/2022 |
2022-03-15 | House | Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 3/22/2022 |
2022-03-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/15/2022 |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2021-03-16 | House | Ref. to Health Committee |
2021-03-15 | House | Sponsor(s) withdrawn. |
2021-03-15 | House | Sponsor change. |
2021-03-11 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-02-22 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2021-02-11 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-10 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0148 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-23 - Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0