TN HB0946 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 26-4)
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 153
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires an LEA to report to the department of education, for each year that the LEA receives an increase in state funding for instructional wages and salaries, how the increase was utilized by the LEA; requires the department of education to report the information to the BEP review committee; requires the BEP review committee to include the information in its annual report on the BEP. - Amends TCA Section 49-3-306.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, requires an LEA to report to the department of education, for each year that the LEA receives an increase in state funding for instructional wages and salaries, how the increase was utilized by the LEA; requires the department of education to report the information to the BEP review committee; requires the BEP review committee to include the information in its annual report on the BEP. - Amends TCA Section 49-3-306.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-24 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 153
2019-04-04HouseComp. SB subst.
2019-03-28HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/4/2019
2019-03-27HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/28/2019
2019-03-27HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2019-03-20HousePlaced on cal. Education for 3/27/2019
2019-03-20HouseNo Action Taken
2019-03-13HousePlaced on cal. Education for 3/20/2019
2019-03-13HouseNo Action Taken
2019-03-06HousePlaced on cal. Education for 3/13/2019
2019-03-06HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education
2019-02-27HousePlaced on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 3/6/2019
2019-02-11HouseAssigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee
2019-02-07HouseP2C, ref. to Education
2019-02-06HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-02-05HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0802 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-24 - Pub. Ch. 153

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback