TN HB0944 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 461
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, revises certain duties of the commission on aging and disability regarding outreach and counseling. - Amends TCA Title 71, Chapter 2.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, revises certain duties of the commission on aging and disability regarding outreach and counseling. - Amends TCA Title 71, Chapter 2.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-26 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 461
2015-04-21HouseComp. SB subst.
2015-04-21HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2015-04-17HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/20/2015
2015-04-15HouseReset on cal. for 4/20/15
2015-04-15HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/16/2015
2015-04-14HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/15/2015
2015-04-08HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2015-04-01HousePlaced on cal. Health Committee for 4/8/2015
2015-04-01HouseAction def. in Health Committee to 4/8/2015
2015-03-25HousePlaced on cal. Health Committee for 4/1/2015
2015-03-24HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee
2015-03-18HousePlaced on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/24/2015
2015-03-03HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c Health Subcommittee of Health Committee
2015-02-25HousePlaced on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/3/2015
2015-02-24HouseAssigned to s/c Health Subcommittee
2015-02-23HouseP2C, ref. to Health Committee
2015-02-18HouseP1C.
2015-02-12HouseIntro.
2015-02-12HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB0941 (Crossfiled) 2015-05-26 - Pub. Ch. 461

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback