TN SB0941 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-26 - Pub. Ch. 461
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-26 - Pub. Ch. 461
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises certain duties of the commission on aging and disability regarding outreach and counseling. - Amends TCA Title 71, Chapter 2.
Title
As enacted, revises certain duties of the commission on aging and disability regarding outreach and counseling. - Amends TCA Title 71, Chapter 2.
Sponsors
Sen. Ken Yager [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-22 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN HOUSE AMEND# 1 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-23 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-23 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-26 | Pub. Ch. 461 | |
2015-05-26 | Effective date(s) 05/18/2015 | |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2015-05-08 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 32, Nays 0 (Amendment 1 - HA0410) |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar 4 calendar for 4/22/2015 |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Held on desk. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar calendar for 4/22/2015 |
2015-04-21 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2015-04-21 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0410) |
2015-04-21 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2015-03-26 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment 1 |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/23/2015 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/18/2015 |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/18/2015 |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/11/2015 |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0944 (Crossfiled) 2015-05-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 461