TN HB0943 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-08 - Assigned to s/c S&LG Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-08 - Assigned to s/c S&LG Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires each LEA to determine each student's, and each health care facility to determine each patient's, citizenship and immigration status; aggregate reports of students and patients to be delivered to general assembly. - Amends TCA Title 33; Title 49 and Title 68, Chapter 11.
Title
As introduced, requires each LEA to determine each student's, and each health care facility to determine each patient's, citizenship and immigration status; aggregate reports of students and patients to be delivered to general assembly. - Amends TCA Title 33; Title 49 and Title 68, Chapter 11.
Sponsors
Rep. Ron Lollar [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-08 | Assigned to s/c S&LG Subcommittee | |
2011-02-17 | P2C, ref. to State & Local Government Committee--Government Operations for review | |
2011-02-16 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-15 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1469 (Crossfiled) 2011-03-22 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. Ed. Com.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0943&ga=107 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/107/Bill/HB0943.pdf |