TN HB0932 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-07 - Assigned to s/c Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-07 - Assigned to s/c Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "Consumer Biometric Data Protection Act." - Amends TCA Title 47; Title 50 and Title 61.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 47; Title 50 and Title 61, relative to biometric data.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee |
2023-02-02 | House | P2C, ref. to Commerce Committee |
2023-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-01-30 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0339 (Crossfiled) 2023-01-25 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee