TN HB0929 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on May 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-24 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 468
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on May 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-24 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 468
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, exempts a person under 18 years of age who is in custody of the department of children's services or receiving foster care services from payment of fees for issuance, renewal, or reinstatement of a driver license, instruction permit, intermediate driver license, or photo identification card. - Amends TCA Title 37; Title 49 and Title 55.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 37; Title 49 and Title 55, relative to fees for driver licenses.
Sponsors
Rep. Sam McKenzie [D] | Rep. Jeremy Faison [R] | Rep. G.A. Hardaway [D] | Rep. Karen Camper [D] |
Rep. Sam Whitson [R] | Rep. Yusuf Hakeem [D] | Rep. John Clemmons [D] | Rep. Dwayne Thompson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-24 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 468 | |
2023-04-20 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-04-20 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2023-04-18 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/20/2023 |
2023-04-18 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/18/2023 |
2023-04-18 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2023-04-18 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-04-18 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/18/2023 |
2023-04-18 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2023-04-12 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/18/2023 |
2023-03-22 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to Driver's License Calendar |
2023-03-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/22/2023 |
2023-03-15 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2023-03-07 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2023-03-01 | House | Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 3/7/2023 |
2023-03-01 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Transportation Committee |
2023-02-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 3/1/2023 |
2023-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee |
2023-02-02 | House | P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee |
2023-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-01-30 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0894 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-24 - Effective date(s) 01/01/2024