TN HB0917 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-01 - Sponsor change.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-01 - Sponsor change.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, revises duties of the commissioner to require the estimated dollar amount needed to implement the long range and coordinated statewide transportation plan be reported to the general assembly every year or more frequently as the commissioner may determine. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 54.
Title
As introduced, revises duties of the commissioner to require the estimated dollar amount needed to implement the long range and coordinated statewide transportation plan be reported to the general assembly every year or more frequently as the commissioner may determine. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 54.
Sponsors
Rep. Don Miller [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-01 | Sponsor change. | |
2011-02-22 | Assigned to s/c General Sub of Transportation | |
2011-02-17 | P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee | |
2011-02-16 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-15 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0675 (Crossfiled) 2011-02-17 - P2C, ref. to S. Trans Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0917&ga=107 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/107/Bill/HB0917.pdf |