TN HB0913 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-02 - Action Def. in State Government Committee to 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-02 - Action Def. in State Government Committee to 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes state employees belonging to a public employee organization to pay dues for only collective bargaining, contract administration and grievance procedures; prohibits work stoppages; changes number of state employees who are entitled to attend statewide meeting of an employee organization from 5 percent to 3 percent. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 23 and Title 8, Chapter 50.
Title
As introduced, authorizes state employees belonging to a public employee organization to pay dues for only collective bargaining, contract administration and grievance procedures; prohibits work stoppages; changes number of state employees who are entitled to attend statewide meeting of an employee organization from 5 percent to 3 percent. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 23 and Title 8, Chapter 50.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-13 - House - (VOICE VOTE) STATE GOVERNMENT SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: State Government Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-02 | House | Action Def. in State Government Committee to 2014 |
2013-03-27 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 4/2/2013 |
2013-03-26 | House | Action Def. in State Government Committee to 4/2/2013 |
2013-03-20 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/26/2013 |
2013-03-19 | House | Action Def. in State Government Committee to 3/26/2013 |
2013-03-13 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/19/2013 |
2013-03-13 | House | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to State Government Committee |
2013-03-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/13/2013 |
2013-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee |
2013-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee |
2013-02-06 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2013-02-05 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0725 (Crossfiled) 2013-03-27 - Failed In S. C&L Comm. Ayes 4, Nays 5 PNV 0