TN HB0912 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-22 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 351
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-22 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 351
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, clarifies definition of "agriculture" for purposes of classification and assessment of property tax. - Amends TCA Title 1; Title 43 and Title 67, Chapter 5.
Title
As enacted, clarifies definition of "agriculture" for purposes of classification and assessment of property tax. - Amends TCA Title 1; Title 43 and Title 67, Chapter 5.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-22 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 351 | |
2017-05-03 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-05-03 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2017-04-27 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/3/2017 |
2017-04-26 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/27/2017 |
2017-04-26 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-04-25 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2017-04-19 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/25/2017 |
2017-04-19 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-04-12 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/19/2017 |
2017-04-12 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2017-04-04 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 4/4/2017 |
2017-03-28 | House | Action def. in Local Government Committee to 4/4/2017 |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/28/2017 |
2017-03-21 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 3/21/2017 |
2017-03-14 | House | Action Def. in s/c Local Government Subcommittee to 3/21/2017 |
2017-03-08 | House | Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 3/14/2017 |
2017-02-17 | House | Assigned to s/c Local Government Subcommittee |
2017-02-16 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-02-13 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2017-02-08 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0904 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-22 - Pub. Ch. 351