TN HB0910 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - Taken off notice for cal. in Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, prohibits an HMO from denying payment for preventative and diagnostic services provided by primary care providers or through a provider's supervision of auxiliary personnel; requires the commissioner of commerce and insurance to report violations to the general assembly. - Amends TCA Title 56, Chapter 32.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, prohibits an HMO from denying payment for preventative and diagnostic services provided by primary care providers or through a provider's supervision of auxiliary personnel; requires the commissioner of commerce and insurance to report violations to the general assembly. - Amends TCA Title 56, Chapter 32.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-15HouseTaken off notice for cal. in Insurance Committee
2019-04-10HousePlaced on cal. Insurance Committee for 4/17/2019
2019-04-10HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Insurance Committee
2019-04-03HousePlaced on s/c cal TennCare Subcommittee for 4/10/2019
2019-04-03HouseMeeting Canceled
2019-03-27HousePlaced on s/c cal TennCare Subcommittee for 4/3/2019
2019-02-11HouseAssigned to s/c TennCare Subcommittee
2019-02-07HouseP2C, ref. to Insurance Committee
2019-02-06HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-02-05HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1369 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-01 - Re-refer to Senate Cal. Comm.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback