TN SB1369 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-01 - Re-refer to Senate Cal. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, prohibits an HMO from denying payment for preventative and diagnostic services provided by primary care providers or through a provider's supervision of auxiliary personnel; requires the commissioner of commerce and insurance to report violations to the general assembly. - Amends TCA Title 56, Chapter 32.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, prohibits an HMO from denying payment for preventative and diagnostic services provided by primary care providers or through a provider's supervision of auxiliary personnel; requires the commissioner of commerce and insurance to report violations to the general assembly. - Amends TCA Title 56, Chapter 32.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-01 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-01SenateRe-refer to Senate Cal. Comm.
2019-03-28SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 4/1/2019
2019-03-26SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2019-03-19SenatePlaced on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/26/2019
2019-02-11SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
2019-02-07SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-02-07SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0910 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-15 - Taken off notice for cal. in Insurance Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback