TN HB0909 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 54-24)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 474
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 54-24)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 474
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, enacts the "Elderly and Vulnerable Adult Protection Act of 2019." - Amends TCA Title 39; Title 40 and Title 71.
Title
As enacted, enacts the "Elderly and Vulnerable Adult Protection Act of 2019." - Amends TCA Title 39; Title 40 and Title 71.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-01 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | Pub. Ch. 474 | |
2019-05-29 | Effective date(s) 05/24/2019; 01/01/2020 | |
2019-05-24 | Signed by Governor. | |
2019-05-17 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-05-10 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-05-08 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0099) |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-04-30 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2019-04-30 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2019-04-30 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0197) |
2019-04-29 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/30/2019 |
2019-04-24 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/29/2019 |
2019-04-24 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-04-24 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/24/2019 |
2019-04-24 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-04-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/24/2019 |
2019-04-03 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2019-03-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/3/2019 |
2019-03-27 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2019-03-27 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Placed on cal. Judiciary for 3/26/2019 |
2019-03-20 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Judiciary |
2019-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/20/2019 |
2019-02-27 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Judiciary |
2019-02-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/27/2019 |
2019-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2019-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to Judiciary-- Government Operations for Review |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1039 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 474