TN HB0909 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-14 - Re-ref. to Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-14 - Re-ref. to Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires local boards of education to admit students from outside their respective local school systems without the approval of the LEA; requires local boards of education to arrange for the transfer of students residing within their systems to schools located outside of their districts; provides for the mandatory transfer of students if the receiving LEA has the available space, teachers, and transportation. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 31.
Title
As introduced, requires local boards of education to admit students from outside their respective local school systems without the approval of the LEA; requires local boards of education to arrange for the transfer of students residing within their systems to schools located outside of their districts; provides for the mandatory transfer of students if the receiving LEA has the available space, teachers, and transportation. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 31.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-14 | House | Re-ref. to Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee |
2016-03-01 | House | Returned to the Desk of the Clerk |
2016-02-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 3/1/2016 |
2015-03-31 | House | Action Def. in s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee to 2016 |
2015-03-25 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 3/31/2015 |
2015-03-24 | House | Action Def. in s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee to 3/31/2015 |
2015-03-18 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 3/24/2015 |
2015-03-17 | House | Action Def. in s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee to 3/24/2015 |
2015-03-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 3/17/2015 |
2015-02-25 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee |
2015-02-23 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Administration & Planning |
2015-02-18 | House | P1C. |
2015-02-12 | House | Intro. |
2015-02-11 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0392 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-23 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0909&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB0909.pdf |