TN HB0904 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-11 - Assigned to s/c Children & Families Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-11 - Assigned to s/c Children & Families Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires a grandparent who has a significant existing relationship with a grandchild to be a party to any termination of the parental rights of the grandparent's child. - Amends TCA Title 36.
Title
As introduced, requires a grandparent who has a significant existing relationship with a grandchild to be a party to any termination of the parental rights of the grandparent's child. - Amends TCA Title 36.
Sponsors
Rep. John Windle [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Children & Families Subcommittee |
2019-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to Judiciary |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1477 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-11 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee