TN HB0904 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-29 - Def. to Summer Study in Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-29 - Def. to Summer Study in Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, separates the 5 percent tax on unprepared food into a 5 percent tax on fresh produce and meat and a 5 percent tax on all other unprepared food. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6.
Title
As introduced, separates the 5 percent tax on unprepared food into a 5 percent tax on fresh produce and meat and a 5 percent tax on all other unprepared food. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6.
Sponsors
Rep. Sabi Kumar [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-29 | House | Def. to Summer Study in Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/29/2017 |
2017-03-22 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2017-03-22 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/22/2017 |
2017-02-13 | House | P2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee-- Finance, Ways & Means |
2017-02-09 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2017-02-08 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0735 (Crossfiled) 2017-03-21 - Refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee w/ neutral recommendation