TN HB0893 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-18 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-18 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, funds special purpose license plates for members of the Tennessee state guard in the same manner as license plates for members of the Tennessee national guard. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 4, Part 2.
Title
As introduced, funds special purpose license plates for members of the Tennessee state guard in the same manner as license plates for members of the Tennessee national guard. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 4, Part 2.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-26 - House - (VOICE VOTE) TRANSPORTATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-20 - House - (VOICE VOTE) TRANSPORTATION SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Transportation Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-20 - House - (VOICE VOTE) TRANSPORTATION SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Transportation Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-18 | House | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2013-04-18 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/18/2013 |
2013-03-13 | House | Placed Behind the Budget |
2013-03-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/13/2013 |
2013-03-05 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2013-02-26 | House | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2013-02-20 | House | Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 2/26/2013 |
2013-02-20 | House | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Transportation Committee |
2013-02-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 2/20/2013 |
2013-02-13 | House | Assigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee |
2013-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee |
2013-02-06 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2013-02-05 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0232 (Crossfiled) 2013-02-13 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.