TN HB0891 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - Comp. SB subst.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, prohibits a court from accepting any plea agreement that allows an elected public official who is charged with an infamous crime involving an offense committed in the person’s official capacity or involving the duties of the person’s office from qualifying for, seeking, or holding public office at some point in the future. - Amends TCA Title 2; Title 8, Chapter 18; Title 39 and Title 40.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, prohibits a court from accepting any plea agreement that allows an elected public official who is charged with an infamous crime involving an offense committed in the person’s official capacity or involving the duties of the person’s office from qualifying for, seeking, or holding public office at some point in the future. - Amends TCA Title 2; Title 8, Chapter 18; Title 39 and Title 40.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-15HouseComp. SB subst.
2019-04-11HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/15/2019
2019-04-10HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/11/2019
2019-04-03HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2019-03-27HousePlaced on cal. Judiciary for 4/3/2019
2019-03-27HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Judiciary
2019-03-20HousePlaced on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/27/2019
2019-03-20HouseAction Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/27/2019
2019-03-13HousePlaced on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/20/2019
2019-03-13HouseAction Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/20/2019
2019-03-06HousePlaced on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/13/2019
2019-02-11HouseAssigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
2019-02-07HouseP2C, ref. to Judiciary
2019-02-06HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-02-05HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0731 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-22 - Concurred, Ayes 26, Nays 3 (Amendment 1 - HA0264)

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback