TN SB0731 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Placed on Senate Message Calendar for 4/22/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, prohibits a court from accepting any plea agreement that allows an elected public official who is charged with an infamous crime involving an offense committed in the person’s official capacity or involving the duties of the person’s office from qualifying for, seeking, or holding public office at some point in the future. - Amends TCA Title 2; Title 8, Chapter 18; Title 39 and Title 40.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, prohibits a court from accepting any plea agreement that allows an elected public official who is charged with an infamous crime involving an offense committed in the person’s official capacity or involving the duties of the person’s office from qualifying for, seeking, or holding public office at some point in the future. - Amends TCA Title 2; Title 8, Chapter 18; Title 39 and Title 40.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 84 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 25 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18SenatePlaced on Senate Message Calendar for 4/22/2019
2019-04-18HousePassed H., Ayes 84, Nays 5, PNV 4
2019-04-17HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/18/19
2019-04-15HouseReset on next avail. cal.
2019-04-15HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2019-04-11SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 26, Nays 3, PNV 2
2019-04-11SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2019-04-09SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/11/2019
2019-04-02SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2019-03-27SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/2/2019
2019-03-26SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
2019-03-20SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/26/2019
2019-03-19SenateAction deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/26/2019
2019-03-13SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/19/2019
2019-02-07SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2019-02-06SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-02-05SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0891 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-15 - Comp. SB subst.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback