TN HB0890 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-28 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-28 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, establishes that the sole educational and experience qualification for the position of highway superintendent in certain counties is a high school education or GED. - Amends TCA Title 54, Chapter 7, Part 1.
Title
As introduced, establishes that the sole educational and experience qualification for the position of highway superintendent in certain counties is a high school education or GED. - Amends TCA Title 54, Chapter 7, Part 1.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-28 | Withdrawn. | |
2011-02-22 | Assigned to s/c General Sub of Transportation | |
2011-02-17 | P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee | |
2011-02-16 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-15 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1107 (Crossfiled) 2012-02-02 - Withdrawn.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0890&ga=107 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/107/Bill/HB0890.pdf |