TN HB0878 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-02-18 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-02-18 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits transfer of funds from the highway fund and other transportation funds. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 9, Chapter 4; Title 54 and Title 67.
Title
As introduced, prohibits transfer of funds from the highway fund and other transportation funds. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 9, Chapter 4; Title 54 and Title 67.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-02-18 | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. | |
2009-02-12 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-11 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1182 (Crossfiled) 2009-04-23 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. F,W&M Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0878&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB0878.pdf |