TN HB0876 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 914
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 914
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, changes references from "social security numbers" to "personally identifying information" in provisions regarding the redaction of certain information in public records to conform with other recently enacted laws. - Amends TCA Title 10, Chapter 7, Part 5.
Title
As enacted, changes references from "social security numbers" to "personally identifying information" in provisions regarding the redaction of certain information in public records to conform with other recently enacted laws. - Amends TCA Title 10, Chapter 7, Part 5.
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Dunn [R] | Rep. Bob Ramsey [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-02 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 914 | |
2016-04-13 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2016-04-07 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-04-07 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/13/2016 |
2016-04-06 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/7/2016 |
2016-04-05 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2016-04-04 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 4/5/2016 |
2016-03-30 | House | Sponsor change. |
2016-03-30 | House | Sponsor(s) withdrawn. |
2016-03-29 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-03-29 | House | Def. to Summer Study |
2016-03-24 | House | Sponsor(s) withdrawn. |
2016-03-24 | House | Sponsor change. |
2016-03-23 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/29/2016 |
2016-03-23 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to State Government Committee |
2016-03-22 | House | Sponsor(s) withdrawn. |
2016-03-16 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/23/2016 |
2016-03-16 | House | Reset on Final cal. of State Government Subcommittee |
2016-03-09 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/16/2016 |
2016-02-11 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-03-04 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c State Government Subcommittee of State Government Committee |
2015-02-25 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/4/2015 |
2015-02-19 | House | Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee |
2015-02-18 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee |
2015-02-12 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2015-02-11 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0910 (Crossfiled) 2016-05-02 - Pub. Ch. 914
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0876&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB0876.pdf |