TN HB0850 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-23 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-23 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires an LEA proposing to close a school to perform an educational, economic, and social impact statement concerning the closure; requires an LEA to conduct town meetings concerning the proposed closure of a school. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
As introduced, requires an LEA proposing to close a school to perform an educational, economic, and social impact statement concerning the closure; requires an LEA to conduct town meetings concerning the proposed closure of a school. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-23 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-02-14 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee |
2017-02-13 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Administration & Planning |
2017-02-09 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2017-02-08 | House | Filed for intro. |