TN HB0846 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on June 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-01 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on June 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-01 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, deletes the requirement that teachers in the special school district of penal and reformatory institutions receive annual compensation at a rate of one tenth times 12 of the annual compensation in effect in the county in which the respective institution is located or one tenth times 12 of the average of the annual compensation of all the counties that are contiguous with the county in which the respective institution is located, whichever is greater, solely out of the state appropriations made to the respective institutions; deletes the prohibition against paying longevity to teachers in such special school district. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 6; Title 8, Chapter 30; Title 41 and Title 49.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4, Chapter 6; Title 8, Chapter 30; Title 41 and Title 49, relative to correctional teachers.
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Sherrell [R] | Rep. Barbara Cooper [D] | Rep. John Windle [D] | Rep. Jerome Moon [R] |
Rep. Kelly Keisling [R] | Rep. Rush Bricken [R] | Rep. John Ragan [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-27 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-01 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2022 | |
2022-06-01 | Pub. Ch. 1047 | |
2022-05-25 | Signed by Governor. | |
2022-05-16 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2022-05-04 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2022-05-02 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - SA0948) |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0154) |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-04-27 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2022-04-27 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2022-04-27 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-04-27 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA1006) |
2022-04-27 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0367) |
2022-04-26 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/27/2022 |
2022-04-26 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/26/2022 |
2022-04-26 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2022-04-26 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/26/2022 |
2022-04-26 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2022-04-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/26/2022 |
2021-05-03 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-04-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 5/3/2021 |
2021-04-27 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2021-04-22 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/27/2021 |
2021-04-21 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2021-04-20 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-04-14 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 4/20/2021 |
2021-04-13 | House | Action def. in State Government Committee to 4/20/2021 |
2021-04-07 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 4/13/2021 |
2021-04-06 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to State Government Committee |
2021-03-31 | House | Placed on s/c cal Corrections Subcommittee for 4/6/2021 |
2021-03-30 | House | Reset on Final cal. of Corrections Subcommittee |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Corrections Subcommittee for 3/30/2021 |
2021-02-20 | House | Assigned to s/c Corrections Subcommittee |
2021-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee |
2021-02-10 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-09 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1599 (Crossfiled) 2022-06-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1047