TN HB0840 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-26 - Taken off notice for cal. in Naming, Designating, & Private Acts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, authorizes the senate or house of representatives to nominate and designate a person as a "Tennessee Pioneer." - Amends TCA Title 3.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, authorizes the senate or house of representatives to nominate and designate a person as a "Tennessee Pioneer." - Amends TCA Title 3.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-26HouseTaken off notice for cal. in Naming, Designating, & Private Acts Committee
2019-02-20HousePlaced on cal. Naming, Designating, & Private Acts Committee for 2/26/2019
2019-02-19HouseMeeting Adjourned
2019-02-13HousePlaced on cal. Naming, Designating, & Private Acts Committee for 2/19/2019
2019-02-07HouseP2C, ref. to Naming, Designating, & Private Acts Committee
2019-02-06HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-02-05HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1378 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-06 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback