TN HB0837 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-02 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, extends certain COVID protections for healthcare providers. - Amends TCA Title 9; Title 14; Title 29, Chapter 20 and Section 49-7-159, and Chapter 896 of the Public Acts of 2022.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 9; Title 14; Title 29, Chapter 20 and Section 49-7-159, and Chapter 896 of the Public Acts of 2022, relative to COVID-19.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-02HouseP2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
2023-02-01HouseIntro., P1C.
2023-01-30HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0911 (Crossfiled) 2023-03-15 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health and Welfare Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback