TN HB0837 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-29 - Pub. Ch. 253
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-29 - Pub. Ch. 253
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, extends the Tennessee film, entertainment and music commission, June 30, 2014. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 4, Chapter 3.
Title
As enacted, extends the Tennessee film, entertainment and music commission, June 30, 2014. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 4, Chapter 3.
Sponsors
Rep. Judd Matheny [R] | Sen. Mike Bell [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-08 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Consent Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-02 - House - (VOICE VOTE) GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-03 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Consent Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-02 - House - (VOICE VOTE) GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-29 | Senate | Pub. Ch. 253 |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Effective date(s) 04/19/2013 |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Signed by S. Speaker |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Signed by H. Speaker |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Passed S., Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2013-04-08 | Senate | S. Subst. HB for comp. SB. |
2013-04-08 | House | Rcvd. from H., P1C. |
2013-04-08 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2013-04-08 | House | Passed H., Ayes 94, Nays 0 |
2013-04-04 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/8/2013 |
2013-04-03 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/3/2013 |
2013-04-02 | House | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee |
2013-03-27 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 4/2/2013 |
2013-03-26 | House | Action Def. in Government Operations Committee to 4/2/2013 |
2013-03-20 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/26/2013 |
2013-03-19 | House | Action Def. in Government Operations Committee to 3/26/2013 |
2013-03-13 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/19/2013 |
2013-02-06 | House | P2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee |
2013-02-04 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2013-02-01 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0361 (Crossfiled) 2013-04-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 253