TN HB0834 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 328
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 328
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes a local school board to create a policy that excuses students who request to attend a released time course in religious moral instruction taught by an independent entity off school property. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 2, Part 1.
Title
As enacted, authorizes a local school board to create a policy that excuses students who request to attend a released time course in religious moral instruction taught by an independent entity off school property. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 2, Part 1.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-06 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 328 | |
2015-04-14 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2015-04-09 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/14/2015 |
2015-04-08 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/9/2015 |
2015-04-08 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-04-07 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2015-04-01 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 4/7/2015 |
2015-03-31 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Government Operations Committee |
2015-03-25 | House | Placed on cal. Education Instruction & Programs for 3/31/2015 |
2015-03-25 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Instruction & Programs |
2015-03-18 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee for 3/25/2015 |
2015-03-18 | House | Action Def. in s/c Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee to 3/25/2015 |
2015-03-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee for 3/18/2015 |
2015-03-11 | House | Action Def. in s/c Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee to 3/18/2015 |
2015-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee for 3/11/2015 |
2015-02-18 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee |
2015-02-18 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Instruction & Programs--Government Operations for review |
2015-02-12 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2015-02-11 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1246 (Crossfiled) 2015-05-06 - Pub. Ch. 328
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0834&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB0834.pdf |