TN HB0822 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-06 - P2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, deletes provision regarding the appointing authority of the defunct Tennessee board for economic growth. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 70.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, deletes provision regarding the appointing authority of the defunct Tennessee board for economic growth. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 70.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-02-06HouseP2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee
2013-02-04HouseIntro., P1C.
2013-02-01HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB0381 (Crossfiled) 2013-03-05 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. C&L Comm.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback