TN HB0817 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-02 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Business & Utilities Subcommittee of Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-02 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Business & Utilities Subcommittee of Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes a municipal electric plant to provide telephone, telegraph, telecommunications services, or other like systems, plants, or equipment within the corporate or county limits of another municipality without needing to obtain consent; increases the minimum download and upload speeds required for an entity to be awarded a broadband accessibility grant. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 7 and Title 65.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 7 and Title 65, relative to telecommunications.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-02 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Business & Utilities Subcommittee of Commerce Committee |
2022-01-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business & Utilities Subcommittee for 2/2/2022 |
2021-03-24 | House | Action Def. in s/c Business & Utilities Subcommittee to First Calendar of 2022 |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business & Utilities Subcommittee for 3/24/2021 |
2021-02-20 | House | Assigned to s/c Business & Utilities Subcommittee |
2021-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to Commerce Committee |
2021-02-10 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-09 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0978 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-30 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee