TN HB0813 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 37-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1064
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 37-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1064
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, reduces Hall income tax from six percent to five percent; expresses legislative intent that the tax be statutorily reduced by one percent annually beginning with the first annual session of the 110th general assembly; eliminates the tax for tax years beginning on or after January 1, 2022. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 2.
Title
As enacted, reduces Hall income tax from six percent to five percent; expresses legislative intent that the tax be statutorily reduced by one percent annually beginning with the first annual session of the 110th general assembly; eliminates the tax for tax years beginning on or after January 1, 2022. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 2.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-23 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1064 | |
2016-04-21 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-04-20 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-04-20 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2016-04-19 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/20/2016 |
2016-04-19 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/19/2016 |
2016-04-19 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2016-04-19 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/19/2016 |
2016-04-19 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2016-04-14 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-04-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/18/2016 |
2016-04-12 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 4/13/2016 |
2016-04-12 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-04-12 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/13/2016 |
2016-04-12 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2016-04-12 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2016-04-12 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 4/12/2016 |
2015-04-14 | House | Taken off notice for cal. in Government Operations Committee |
2015-04-13 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 4/14/2015 |
2015-04-06 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-03-02 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-02-18 | House | P2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee for review--Finance |
2015-02-12 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2015-02-11 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0047 (Crossfiled) 2016-05-23 - Pub. Ch. 1064
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0813&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB0813.pdf |