TN SB0047 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 26-1)
Status: Passed on May 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-23 - Pub. Ch. 1064
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 26-1)
Status: Passed on May 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-23 - Pub. Ch. 1064
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, reduces Hall income tax from six percent to five percent; expresses legislative intent that the tax be statutorily reduced by one percent annually beginning with the first annual session of the 110th general assembly; eliminates the tax for tax years beginning on or after January 1, 2022. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 2.
Title
As enacted, reduces Hall income tax from six percent to five percent; expresses legislative intent that the tax be statutorily reduced by one percent annually beginning with the first annual session of the 110th general assembly; eliminates the tax for tax years beginning on or after January 1, 2022. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 2.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-22 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Make Action of the Senate MOTION TO ADOPT Conference Committee Report (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION MOTION TO ADOPT CONFERENCE COMMITTEE REPORT (Y: 56 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT CONFERENCE COMMITTEE REPORT (Y: 66 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT MINORITY REPORT (Y: 48 N: 33 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 78 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 11, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 1 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION MOTION TO ADOPT CONFERENCE COMMITTEE REPORT (Y: 56 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT CONFERENCE COMMITTEE REPORT (Y: 66 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT MINORITY REPORT (Y: 48 N: 33 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 78 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 11, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 1 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-23 | Pub. Ch. 1064 | |
2016-05-23 | Effective date(s) 05/20/2016 | |
2016-05-20 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2016-05-16 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2016-05-13 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2016-05-06 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2016-04-22 | House | Conf. comm. report adopted, Ayes 66, Nays 17 PNV 0 |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Conference Committee report adopted, ayes 29 nays 1 |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar calendar for 4/22/2016 |
2016-04-21 | House | Conf. comm. appointed. ( Casada, McCormick, Dunn, Hicks, Shepard) |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Conference Committee appointed. (McNally, Norris, Watson, Green, Tate) |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Senate refused to recede from its non-concurrence. |
2016-04-21 | House | H. refused to recede from am. no. HA1241 SB0047 |
2016-04-21 | House | H. Placed on Message Calendar 2 for 4/21/2016 |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Senate refused to concur in H. amendment #3 |
2016-04-21 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 78, Nays 9, PNV 2 |
2016-04-21 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 4 - HA1254) |
2016-04-21 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2016-04-21 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/21/2016 |
2016-04-21 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/21/2016 |
2016-04-20 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/21/2016 |
2016-04-20 | House | Re-ref. Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2016-04-20 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 3 - HA1241) |
2016-04-20 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - HA1224) |
2016-04-20 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA1176) |
2016-04-20 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2016-04-20 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 1, PNV 1 |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 4 - SA0511) |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 3 - SA0496) |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - SA0447) |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0446) |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 5 - SA1034) |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/19/2016 |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 11, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/18/2016 |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/18/2016 |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee3 calendar for 4/13/2016 |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/13/2016 |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee3 calendar for 4/12/2016 |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Re-refer to Senate FW&M Comm. |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 2/24/2016 |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 2/24/2016 |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 2/22/2016 |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 2/22/2016 |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 2/17/2016 |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 11, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 2/9/2016 |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Re-refer to Senate FW&M Comm. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 1 |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/21/2015 |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/16/2015 |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/15/2015 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee w/recommend, as amended |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/24/2015 |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee to 3/24/2015 |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/17/2015 |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Refer to Senate Revenue Subcommittee |
2015-01-17 | Senate | Refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2015-01-16 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, held on desk pending committee appointments. |
2015-01-15 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0813 (Crossfiled) 2016-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1064