TN HB0789 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 980
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 980
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, enacts the "Student Due Process Protection Act". - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 5; Title 10, Chapter 7; Title 24 and Title 49.
Title
As enacted, enacts the "Student Due Process Protection Act". - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 5; Title 10, Chapter 7; Title 24 and Title 49.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-23 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 980 | |
2018-04-23 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-04-23 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2018-04-18 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/19/2018 |
2018-04-18 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/18/2018 |
2018-04-18 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-04-18 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/18/2018 |
2018-04-18 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-04-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/17/2018 |
2018-04-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/13/2018 |
2018-04-03 | House | Reset on Final cal. of Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2018-03-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/3/2018 |
2018-03-28 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 4/4/2018 |
2018-03-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/28/2018 |
2017-05-08 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-05-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 5/8/2017 |
2017-04-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 5/2/2017 |
2017-04-26 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2017-04-25 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/26/2017 |
2017-04-25 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2017-04-25 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-04-19 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 4/26/2017 |
2017-04-11 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Government Operations Committee |
2017-04-05 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration & Planning for 4/11/2017 |
2017-04-04 | House | Action def. in Education Administration & Planning to 4/11/2017 |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration & Planning for 4/4/2017 |
2017-03-28 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Administration & Planning |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 3/28/2017 |
2017-03-22 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-03-21 | House | Action Def. in s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee to 3/28/2017 |
2017-03-20 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 3/21/2017 |
2017-03-07 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee of Education Administration & Planning |
2017-03-01 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 3/7/2017 |
2017-02-14 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee |
2017-02-13 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Administration & Planning |
2017-02-09 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2017-02-08 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0824 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-23 - Pub. Ch. 980