TN HB0772 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-19 - Effective date(s) 05/11/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-19 - Effective date(s) 05/11/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, provides that a candidate's name may only be printed on the ballot if it is the name of a person whom the chair of a statewide political party has certified to be placed on the ballot for the office of president to the secretary of state; transfers responsibility for notifying county election commissions of candidate names that must appear on the ballot for each political party in the presidential preference primary from the secretary of state to the coordinator of elections; requires members of the state election commission to disclose any employment or the receipt of compensation, received for services related to elections. - Amends TCA Title 2.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 2, relative to elections.
Sponsors
Rep. Tim Rudd [R] | Rep. Debra Moody [R] | Rep. Dan Howell [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-19 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 26 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-10 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 73 N: 22 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-10 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 73 N: 22 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-19 | Effective date(s) 05/11/2023 | |
2023-05-19 | Pub. Ch. 389 | |
2023-05-11 | Signed by Governor. | |
2023-05-04 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2023-04-28 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2023-04-25 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 25, Nays 6 |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/19/2023 |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/19/2023 |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0342) |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-04-11 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2023-04-10 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 73, Nays 22, PNV 1 |
2023-04-10 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-04-10 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0355) |
2023-04-06 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/10/2023 |
2023-04-05 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/6/2023 |
2023-04-04 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2023-03-29 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 4/4/2023 |
2023-03-29 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee |
2023-03-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee for 3/29/2023 |
2023-03-22 | House | Action Def. in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee to 3/29/2023 |
2023-03-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee for 3/22/2023 |
2023-03-14 | House | Sponsor(s) withdrawn. |
2023-03-14 | House | Sponsor change. |
2023-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee |
2023-02-02 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2023-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-01-30 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1182 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-19 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 389