TN HB0771 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-24 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-24 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits prosecution for crimes in title 39, chapter 17, part 4, if the prosecution is based on evidence acquired as a result of a person seeking emergency medical assistance for someone experiencing a drug-related overdose. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 4.
Title
As introduced, prohibits prosecution for crimes in title 39, chapter 17, part 4, if the prosecution is based on evidence acquired as a result of a person seeking emergency medical assistance for someone experiencing a drug-related overdose. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 4.
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Dunn [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-24 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee |
2015-03-18 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/24/2015 |
2015-02-19 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2015-02-18 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee--Health |
2015-02-12 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2015-02-11 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0841 (Crossfiled) 2015-02-18 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0771&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB0771.pdf |