TN HB0758 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-25 - Pub. Ch. 228
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-25 - Pub. Ch. 228
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, adds exceptions to the licensure requirements under the Tennessee Residential Lending, Brokerage and Servicing Act. - Amends TCA Title 45, Chapter 13.
Title
As enacted, adds exceptions to the licensure requirements under the Tennessee Residential Lending, Brokerage and Servicing Act. - Amends TCA Title 45, Chapter 13.
Sponsors
Rep. Curry Todd [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-02 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-25 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-04-12 - House - (VOICE VOTE) COMMERCE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-04-06 - House - (VOICE VOTE) COMMERCE SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Commerce Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-04-25 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-04-12 - House - (VOICE VOTE) COMMERCE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-04-06 - House - (VOICE VOTE) COMMERCE SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Commerce Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-25 | Pub. Ch. 228 | |
2011-05-25 | Effective date(s) 05/20/11 | |
2011-05-20 | Signed by Governor. | |
2011-05-10 | Transmitted to Governor for his action. | |
2011-05-09 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2011-05-04 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2011-05-03 | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. | |
2011-05-02 | Passed S., Ayes 29, Nays 0 | |
2011-05-02 | S. Subst. HB for comp. SB. | |
2011-04-28 | Rcvd. from H., P1C. | |
2011-04-25 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. | |
2011-04-25 | Passed H., as am., Ayes 97, Nays 0 | |
2011-04-25 | H. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - HA0187) | |
2011-04-19 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/25/2011 | |
2011-04-15 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/19/2011 | |
2011-04-12 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2011-04-06 | Placed on cal. Commerce Committee for 4/12/2011 | |
2011-04-06 | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Commerce Committee | |
2011-03-30 | Placed on s/c cal Commerce Subcommittee for 4/6/2011 | |
2011-03-23 | Action Def. in s/c Commerce Subcommittee to 4/6/2011 | |
2011-03-16 | Placed on s/c cal Commerce Subcommittee for 3/23/2011 | |
2011-03-09 | Action Def. in s/c Commerce Subcommittee to 3/23/2011 | |
2011-03-02 | Placed on s/c cal Commerce Subcommittee for 3/9/2011 | |
2011-02-22 | Assigned to s/c General Sub of Commerce | |
2011-02-17 | P2C, ref. to Commerce Committee | |
2011-02-16 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-14 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1158 (Crossfiled) 2011-05-25 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 228