TN HB0751 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-30 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Education Instruction Subcommittee of Education Instruction
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, expands the Individualized Education Act to allow a child with dyslexia to be eligible for the individualized education account program. - Amends TCA Title 49.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, relative to education.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-30HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c Education Instruction Subcommittee of Education Instruction
2021-03-24HousePlaced on s/c cal Education Instruction Subcommittee for 3/30/2021
2021-03-23HouseAction Def. in s/c Education Instruction Subcommittee to 3/30/2021
2021-03-17HousePlaced on s/c cal Education Instruction Subcommittee for 3/23/2021
2021-02-20HouseAssigned to s/c Education Instruction Subcommittee
2021-02-11HouseP2C, ref. to Education Instruction
2021-02-10HouseIntro., P1C.
2021-02-09HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1158 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-22 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback