TN HB0745 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-07 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-07 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "Transparency in Charter School Finance Act." - Amends TCA Title 10, Chapter 7 and Title 49, Chapter 13.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 10, Chapter 7 and Title 49, Chapter 13, relative to charter schools.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-07 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-02-01 | House | Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee |
2023-02-01 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Administration |
2023-01-30 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-01-27 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1026 (Crossfiled) 2023-02-06 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee