TN HB0744 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, creates a Second Amendment sales tax holiday for the first weekend of September of each year for firearms and ammunition. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6.
Title
As introduced, creates a Second Amendment sales tax holiday for the first weekend of September of each year for firearms and ammunition. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6.
Sponsors
Rep. Dennis Powers [R] | Rep. Ryan Williams [R] | Rep. Jeremy Faison [R] | Rep. James Van Huss [R] |
Rep. John Crawford [R] | Rep. Matthew Hill [R] | Rep. Timothy Hill [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-04-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/18/18 |
2018-04-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/13/2018 |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2018-02-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 2/28/2018 |
2018-02-21 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 2/28/2018 |
2018-02-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 2/21/2018 |
2018-02-14 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 2/21/2018 |
2018-02-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 2/14/2018 |
2018-02-07 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 2/14/2018 |
2018-01-31 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 2/7/2018 |
2018-01-31 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 2/7/2018 |
2018-01-31 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-01-30 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-01-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 1/31/2018 |
2017-05-08 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-05-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 5/8/2017 |
2017-04-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 5/2/2017 |
2017-03-23 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2017-03-08 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/15/2017 |
2017-02-14 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2017-02-13 | House | P2C, ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2017-02-08 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1004 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-08 - Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/9/2017