TN HB0743 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-06 - Action Def. in s/c State Government of S&LG to 2010
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-06 - Action Def. in s/c State Government of S&LG to 2010
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, removes certain restrictions on immediate family members of ethics commission members and staff and registry of election finance members and staff. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 10 and Title 3, Chapter 6.
Title
As introduced, removes certain restrictions on immediate family members of ethics commission members and staff and registry of election finance members and staff. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 10 and Title 3, Chapter 6.
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Odom [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-06 | Action Def. in s/c State Government of S&LG to 2010 | |
2009-04-29 | Placed on s/c cal State Government of S&LG for 05/06/2009 | |
2009-02-18 | Assigned to s/c State Government of S&LG | |
2009-02-18 | P2C, ref. to State & Local Government | |
2009-02-12 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-11 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1124 (Crossfiled) 2009-02-18 - P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0743&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB0743.pdf |