TN HB0734 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-03 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-03 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the board of pharmacy to review its rules regarding the board's oversight of facilities that manufacture, warehouse, and distribute medical devices every two years instead of every three years. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 33; Title 56; Title 63 and Title 68.
Title
As introduced, requires the board of pharmacy to review its rules regarding the board's oversight of facilities that manufacture, warehouse, and distribute medical devices every two years instead of every three years. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 33; Title 56; Title 63 and Title 68.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-03 | House | Returned to the Clerk's Desk. |
2019-03-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Health Subcommittee for 4/3/2019 |
2019-03-27 | House | Action Def. in s/c Public Health Subcommittee to 4/3/2019 |
2019-03-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Health Subcommittee for 3/27/2019 |
2019-03-13 | House | Action Def. in s/c Public Health Subcommittee to 3/27/2019 |
2019-03-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Health Subcommittee for 3/13/2019 |
2019-03-04 | House | Assigned to s/c Public Health Subcommittee |
2019-03-04 | House | Ref. to Health Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1471 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-10 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health and Welfare Committee