TN HB0720 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-04 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-04 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits interrogation or interview of a child who has been taken into custody due to suspicion that the child committed a delinquent act or unruly conduct except in the presence of the child's legal counsel, parent, guardian, or custodian; requires that a video recording be made of the interview and that the child be informed of certain rights. - Amends TCA Title 37 and Title 39.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 37 and Title 39, relative to juvenile justice.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Sparks [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-04 | House | Returned to the Clerk's Desk. |
2023-04-04 | House | Def. to Special Calendar to be Published with Final Calendar in Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2023-03-29 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 4/4/2023 |
2023-03-28 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 4/4/2023 |
2023-03-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/28/2023 |
2023-03-21 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/28/2023 |
2023-03-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/21/2023 |
2023-03-14 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/21/2023 |
2023-03-08 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/14/2023 |
2023-03-07 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/14/2023 |
2023-03-01 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/7/2023 |
2023-02-21 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/7/2023 |
2023-02-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/21/2023 |
2023-02-01 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2023-02-01 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2023-01-30 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-01-27 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0509 (Crossfiled) 2023-03-28 - Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to first calendar of 2024