TN HB0703 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-11 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-11 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, changes, from 30 days to 60 days, the time in which a respondent who is not satisfied with the amount deposited by a condemner, or otherwise objects to a taking through the use of eminent domain, must file an answer to the petition initiating a condemnation proceeding. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 3, Part 20; Title 29, Chapter 17; Title 29, Chapter 16 and Title 58, Chapter 2.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4, Chapter 3, Part 20; Title 29, Chapter 17; Title 29, Chapter 16 and Title 58, Chapter 2, relative to the use of eminent domain.
Sponsors
Rep. Sam Whitson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-11 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2021-02-10 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-09 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1020 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-22 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee