TN HB0701 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 379
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 379
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, allows candidate and political campaign committee to accept digital currency as a contribution; requires increase in value of digital currency to be reported as interest on statements filed with the registry of election finance; requires candidate to sell digital currency and deposit proceeds before spending the funds. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 10.
Title
As enacted, allows candidate and political campaign committee to accept digital currency as a contribution; requires increase in value of digital currency to be reported as interest on statements filed with the registry of election finance; requires candidate to sell digital currency and deposit proceeds before spending the funds. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 10.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-18 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 379 | |
2015-04-20 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2015-04-17 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/20/2015 |
2015-04-15 | House | Reset on cal. for 4/20/15 |
2015-04-13 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/14/2015 |
2015-04-13 | House | Reset on next avail. cal. |
2015-04-09 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/13/2015 |
2015-04-09 | House | Reset on next avail. cal. |
2015-04-02 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/9/2015 |
2015-04-01 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/2/2015 |
2015-03-24 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2015-03-18 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/24/2015 |
2015-03-18 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee |
2015-03-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 3/18/2015 |
2015-02-19 | House | Assigned to s/c Local Government Subcommittee |
2015-02-18 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2015-02-12 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2015-02-11 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0674 (Crossfiled) 2015-05-18 - Pub. Ch. 379
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0701&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB0701.pdf |