TN SB0674 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-18 - Pub. Ch. 379
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, allows candidate and political campaign committee to accept digital currency as a contribution; requires increase in value of digital currency to be reported as interest on statements filed with the registry of election finance; requires candidate to sell digital currency and deposit proceeds before spending the funds. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 10.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, allows candidate and political campaign committee to accept digital currency as a contribution; requires increase in value of digital currency to be reported as interest on statements filed with the registry of election finance; requires candidate to sell digital currency and deposit proceeds before spending the funds. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 10.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-20 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 61 N: 28 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - Senate - SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-18 Pub. Ch. 379
2015-05-18 Effective date(s) 04/30/2015
2015-04-30SenateSigned by Governor.
2015-04-23SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2015-04-22HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2015-04-22SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2015-04-21SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2015-04-20HousePassed H., Ayes 61, Nays 28, PNV 2
2015-04-20HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2015-04-01HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2015-03-30SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2015-03-30SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 33, Nays 0
2015-03-26SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 3/30/2015
2015-03-24SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2015-03-18SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/24/2015
2015-02-18SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
2015-02-12SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2015-02-11SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0701 (Crossfiled) 2015-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 379

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback