TN HB0680 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-03 - Re-refer to Senate Calendar Committee
Pending: Senate Calendar Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-03 - Re-refer to Senate Calendar Committee
Pending: Senate Calendar Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, repeals present law requirement that marinas, campgrounds, golf courses, cabins, gift shops, restaurants, and inns at state parks be self-sufficient in terms of revenue generated; repeals schedule of priority for spending revenue that exceeds what is required for self-sufficiency of those facilities. - Amends TCA Title 11, Chapter 3, Part 3.
Title
As introduced, repeals present law requirement that marinas, campgrounds, golf courses, cabins, gift shops, restaurants, and inns at state parks be self-sufficient in terms of revenue generated; repeals schedule of priority for spending revenue that exceeds what is required for self-sufficiency of those facilities. - Amends TCA Title 11, Chapter 3, Part 3.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-03 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 9 N: 17 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-24 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-03 | Senate | Re-refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Failed to pass Senate (Rejected), Ayes 9, Nays 17, PNV 3 |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0235) |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-04-25 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2017-04-24 | House | Passed H., Ayes 87, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2017-04-20 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/24/2017 |
2017-04-19 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/20/2017 |
2017-04-12 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-04-11 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2017-04-05 | House | Placed on cal. Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee for 4/11/2017 |
2017-04-04 | House | Action def. in Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee to 4/11/2017 |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on cal. Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee for 4/4/2017 |
2017-03-29 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 3/29/2017 |
2017-03-22 | House | Action Def. in s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee to 3/29/2017 |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 3/22/2017 |
2017-03-01 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee of Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
2017-02-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 3/1/2017 |
2017-02-14 | House | Assigned to s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee |
2017-02-13 | House | P2C, ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2017-02-08 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0621 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-03 - Companion House Bill substituted