TN HB0677 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 262
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 262
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires court clerks to report the race, sex, and, if known, social security number of a person judicially committed or adjudicated a mental defective to the federal bureau of investigation-NICS index and the department of safety for use in determining a person's eligibility to purchase firearms; requires that such information be confidential. - Amends TCA Title 16; Title 33 and Section 38-6-109.
Title
As enacted, requires court clerks to report the race, sex, and, if known, social security number of a person judicially committed or adjudicated a mental defective to the federal bureau of investigation-NICS index and the department of safety for use in determining a person's eligibility to purchase firearms; requires that such information be confidential. - Amends TCA Title 16; Title 33 and Section 38-6-109.
Sponsors
Rep. Johnny Garrett [R] | Rep. Rick Staples [D] | Rep. G.A. Hardaway [D] | Rep. Mark White [R] |
Rep. Antonio Parkinson [D] | Rep. Patsy Hazlewood [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 262 | |
2019-04-08 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2019-04-04 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/8/2019 |
2019-04-03 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/4/2019 |
2019-03-20 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-03-13 | House | Placed on cal. Judiciary for 3/20/2019 |
2019-03-13 | House | Action def. in Judiciary to 3/20/2019 |
2019-03-06 | House | Placed on cal. Judiciary for 3/13/2019 |
2019-03-06 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Judiciary |
2019-02-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee for 3/6/2019 |
2019-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee |
2019-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to Judiciary |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0472 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-09 - Pub. Ch. 262